Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/31/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/08/2014