Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/10/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/11/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/21/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/23/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/11/2014