Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/10/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/05/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/09/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/23/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/19/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/03/2014