Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/09/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/27/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/21/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/09/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/17/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/14/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/19/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/03/2014