Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/11/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/30/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 09/30/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/10/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/10/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/10/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 12/10/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 12/10/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 12/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 12/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/09/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/27/2014
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 01/27/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/03/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/25/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/05/2014
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 03/05/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/05/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/11/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/24/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 03/24/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/27/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 04/30/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/30/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 04/30/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/09/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/19/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/21/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 05/21/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/21/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/21/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/28/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/05/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/05/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/23/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/23/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/03/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/29/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/30/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 07/31/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 09/09/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/09/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/09/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/11/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/17/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/14/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/14/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/14/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/19/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 11/19/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 12/03/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/03/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/03/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/03/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 12/03/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 12/03/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/03/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/03/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/03/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/08/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 12/08/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/08/2014