Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/30/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/30/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/10/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 12/10/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 12/10/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 12/10/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 12/10/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 12/10/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 12/12/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/19/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 12/19/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 01/09/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 01/13/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/13/2014
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/27/2014
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/03/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/03/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 02/25/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/11/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 03/27/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/09/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/19/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 05/19/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/21/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 05/21/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/21/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/28/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 06/05/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/05/2014
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 06/09/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/23/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/23/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 07/29/2014
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 07/29/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/30/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/30/2014
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/30/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/31/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/31/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/31/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/01/2014
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/09/2014
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/09/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/09/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/09/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 09/11/2014
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/17/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/18/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 11/14/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 11/14/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 11/14/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/19/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/19/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 12/03/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/03/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/03/2014