Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 12/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/12/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 12/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 12/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/12/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 12/19/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/06/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/06/2014
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/06/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 02/06/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/06/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 02/11/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/25/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 02/25/2014
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 02/25/2014
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 02/26/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/26/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 02/26/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 02/26/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/26/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 02/26/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/27/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 02/27/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 03/04/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/05/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/05/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 03/05/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 03/05/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/06/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/13/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/14/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/24/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 04/02/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/02/2014
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/04/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/04/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/08/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 04/08/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/08/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 04/10/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/10/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/28/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/30/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/30/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/06/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/06/2014
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/06/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/06/2014
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 06/10/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/23/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/23/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 07/23/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/24/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/24/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/24/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/24/2014
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/25/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/25/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/25/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/25/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/25/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 07/25/2014
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 07/31/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/31/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 07/31/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 09/15/2014