Committees: H.R.3 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/15/2013 Referred to
05/16/2013 Markup by
05/17/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-61,Part 3
House Energy and Commerce03/15/2013 Referred to
04/17/2013 Markup by
05/17/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-61,Part 1
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power03/22/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources03/15/2013 Referred to
04/24/2013 Markup by
05/17/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-61,Part 2
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources03/25/2013 Referred to
04/16/2013 Hearings by
04/24/2013 Markup by
04/24/2013 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation03/25/2013 Referred to
04/24/2014 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs03/25/2013 Referred to
04/24/2014 Discharged from