Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Stutzman, Marlin A. [R-IN-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/26/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/26/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 10/11/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/05/2013