Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/10/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/18/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 09/26/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/07/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/18/2013