Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 01/15/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/22/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 01/22/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/22/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/25/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 01/25/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/05/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/05/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/05/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/05/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/05/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/14/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/26/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/26/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/26/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 02/26/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/26/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/26/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/28/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/04/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/11/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/12/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/23/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/14/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/16/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/22/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/16/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/25/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/26/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/26/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/09/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 09/09/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 09/09/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/09/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 09/16/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/17/2013