Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/09/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 09/16/2014