Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/02/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 10/10/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 12/12/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 12/12/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/23/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/08/2014