Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/20/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/09/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/04/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/04/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/19/2014