Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/14/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/04/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/11/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/19/2014