Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/18/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/11/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/08/2014