Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/18/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/26/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/30/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/04/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/07/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/09/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/14/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 10/23/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 10/28/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/18/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/19/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/20/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/20/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 12/02/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/03/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/04/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 12/05/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 12/16/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/09/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 01/09/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/09/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 01/13/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/14/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/16/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/16/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 02/04/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/10/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 02/11/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/26/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/04/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 03/04/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/11/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/12/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 03/12/2014
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/24/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/02/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/08/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 05/19/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/19/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/20/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/22/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/08/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/18/2014