Refine your search

6 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
09/26/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-168.
09/26/2014 Signed by President.
09/23/2014 Presented to President.
09/18/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5862)
09/16/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7600)
08/02/2013 Introduced in House