Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/25/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/25/2014