Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/09/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/11/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 10/03/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/08/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 10/11/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/15/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 11/21/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 12/05/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/19/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/07/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/13/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 01/17/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/25/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/24/2014
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/01/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/01/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/28/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/08/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/11/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/16/2014