Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/18/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-248.
12/18/2014 Signed by President.
12/12/2014 Presented to President.
12/11/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2014 Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6607)
09/15/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7464-7465)
07/24/2014 Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-553.
08/02/2013 Introduced in House