Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/06/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 09/06/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 09/10/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/16/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/20/2013