Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
06/09/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-115.
06/09/2014 Signed by President.
05/30/2014 Presented to President.
05/21/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3243)
05/21/2014 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
03/24/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 0 (Roll no. 136).(text: CR H2570)
08/02/2013 Introduced in House