There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 232 Southwest Johnson Avenue in Burleson, Texas, as the "Sergeant William Moody Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/09/2014Became Public Law No: 113-115. (TXT | PDF)
06/09/2014Signed by President.
05/30/2014Presented to President.
05/21/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3243)
05/21/2014Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
03/24/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 0 (Roll no. 136).(text: CR H2570)
08/02/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
06/09/2014Became Public Law No: 113-115. (TXT | PDF)
06/09/2014Signed by President.
05/30/2014HousePresented to President.
05/22/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/21/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3243)
05/21/2014SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 389.
05/21/2014SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
05/21/2014SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
03/25/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
03/24/2014-6:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 0 (Roll no. 136). (text: CR H2570)
03/24/2014-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2589-2590)
03/24/2014-4:22pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
03/24/2014-4:13pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3060.
03/24/2014-4:13pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2570-2571)
03/24/2014-4:13pmHouseMr. Farenthold moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/12/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/12/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
08/02/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
08/02/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 08/02/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 08/02/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 08/02/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform08/02/2013 Referred to
03/12/2014 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs03/25/2014 Referred to
05/21/2014 Markup by
05/21/2014 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.3060.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3060. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-115 (06/09/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 232 Southwest Johnson Avenue in Burleson, Texas, as the "Sergeant William Moody Post Office Building."