Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 08/02/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/07/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/16/2013