Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/11/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/23/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 12/11/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/16/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/04/2014