Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 11/15/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/22/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 12/02/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/16/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/04/2014