Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/19/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 10/02/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/11/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/15/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/02/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/09/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 12/12/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/16/2013