Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/10/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/08/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/11/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 10/16/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 10/23/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/22/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 12/03/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 12/05/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/10/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 12/16/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 12/16/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/08/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/26/2014
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 07/08/2014