Refine your search

Showing 15 of 15 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
06/10/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-121.
06/10/2014 Signed by President.
06/03/2014 Presented to President.
05/22/2014 Conference report agreed to in Senate: Senate agreed to conference report by Yea-Nay Vote. 91 - 7. Record Vote Number: 163.
05/20/2014 Conference report agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the conference report Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 412 - 4 (Roll No. 220).(consideration: CR H4495-4496)
05/15/2014 Conference report filed: Conference report H. Rept. 113-449 filed.(text of conference report: CR H4065-4428)
11/20/2013 Conference committee actions: Conference held.
10/31/2013 To conference: Senate insisted on its amendment, requested a conference.(consideration: CR S7778)
10/31/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/23/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 417 - 3 (Roll no. 560).
10/21/2013 Committee on Natural Resources discharged.
10/21/2013 Committee on Ways and Means discharged.
10/21/2013 Committee on Budget discharged.
10/21/2013 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-246, Part I.
09/11/2013 Introduced in House