Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 09/11/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/11/2013
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3]* 09/11/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/11/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/11/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 09/11/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 09/11/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 09/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/11/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 09/18/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/25/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/26/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/08/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/08/2014