Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/16/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-214.
12/16/2014 Signed by President.
12/08/2014 Presented to President.
12/03/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6305-6306)
11/13/2014 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Carper without amendment. Without written report.
07/14/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6159)
09/12/2013 Introduced in House