Text: H.R.3086 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Received in Senate (07/16/2014)


113th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 3086

IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
July 16, 2014

Received


AN ACT

To permanently extend the Internet Tax Freedom Act.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Permanent Internet Tax Freedom Act”.

SEC. 2. Permanent moratorium on Internet access taxes and multiple and discriminatory taxes on electronic commerce.

(a) In general.—Section 1101(a) of the Internet Tax Freedom Act (47 U.S.C. 151 note) is amended by striking “ during the period beginning November 1, 2003, and ending November 1, 2014”.

(b) Effective date.—The amendment made by this section shall apply to taxes imposed after the date of the enactment of this Act.

Passed the House of Representatives July 15, 2014.

Attest: karen l. haas,   
Clerk