Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/25/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/25/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 10/11/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/02/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 03/14/2014
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/12/2014