Refine your search

Showing 15 of 15 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
09/30/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-38.
09/30/2013 Signed by President.
09/27/2013 House Presented to President.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: Senate
09/25/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR 9/24/2013 S6901-6902)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
09/18/2013 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
09/17/2013-6:57pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 2 (Roll no. 460). (tex: CR H5569-5570)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2013-6:31pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5572-5573)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2013-5:50pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2013-5:35pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3092.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2013-5:35pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5569-5572)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/17/2013-5:35pm House Mr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives