Refine your search

Showing 21 of 21 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
10/15/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-45.
10/15/2013 Signed by President.
10/07/2013 House Presented to President.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/05/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: Senate
10/04/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7213)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: Senate
09/27/2013 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
09/26/2013-1:12pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 0 (Roll no. 486). (text: CR 9/25/2013 H5815)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/26/2013-12:39pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5846-5847)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013-5:57pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013-5:48pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3095.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013-5:48pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5815-5816)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013-5:48pm House Mr. Petri moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
09/25/2013 House Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-225.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
09/19/2013 House Subcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
09/19/2013 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
09/19/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
09/13/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure
09/12/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
09/12/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives