There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that any new or revised requirement providing for the screening, testing, or treatment of individuals operating commercial motor vehicles for sleep disorders is adopted pursuant to a rulemaking proceeding, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/15/2013Became Public Law No: 113-45. (TXT | PDF)
10/15/2013Signed by President.
10/07/2013Presented to President.
10/04/2013Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7213)
09/26/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 0 (Roll no. 486).(text: CR 9/25/2013 H5815)
09/25/2013Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-225.
09/12/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/15/2013Became Public Law No: 113-45. (TXT | PDF)
10/15/2013Signed by President.
10/07/2013HousePresented to President.
10/05/2013SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/04/2013SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7213)
09/27/2013SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
09/26/2013-1:12pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 405 - 0 (Roll no. 486). (text: CR 9/25/2013 H5815)
09/26/2013-12:39pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5846-5847)
09/25/2013-5:57pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/25/2013-5:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3095.
09/25/2013-5:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5815-5816)
09/25/2013-5:48pmHouseMr. Petri moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/25/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
09/25/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 113-225.
09/19/2013HouseSubcommittee on Highways and Transit Discharged.
09/19/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/19/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/13/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/12/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
09/12/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (69)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/17/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/17/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/17/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/17/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/17/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/17/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 09/17/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/17/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/17/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/17/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/18/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 09/18/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 09/18/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/18/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/18/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/19/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/19/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/20/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/20/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/25/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/25/2013

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/12/2013 Referred to
09/19/2013 Markup by
09/25/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-225
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Highways and Transit09/13/2013 Referred to
09/19/2013 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3095. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-45 (10/15/2013)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Authorizes the Secretary of Transportation (DOT) to implement or enforce a requirement providing for the screening, testing, or treatment of individuals operating commercial motor vehicles for sleep disorders (including obstructive sleep apnea) only if it is adopted pursuant to a rulemaking proceeding.

Applies this Act only to a requirement adopted on or after September 1, 2013.