Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 09/17/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 09/17/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 09/17/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/17/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/17/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/17/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/17/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/17/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/17/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 09/17/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/18/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 09/18/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 09/18/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/18/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 09/18/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/18/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/19/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/19/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 09/19/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/19/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/20/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 09/20/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 09/20/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 09/25/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/25/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/25/2013