Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/12/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/30/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/04/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/11/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 10/28/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 11/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/16/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 01/09/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 01/29/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/10/2014
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/09/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/15/2014