Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 01/23/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/17/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/08/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 07/16/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 07/18/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/18/2013