Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/18/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large]* 01/18/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 01/18/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 01/22/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 01/22/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/25/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/11/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/18/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/11/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 01/09/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 02/14/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/08/2014