Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 09/19/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/19/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 09/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/19/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 09/19/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 09/23/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/26/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/03/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/15/2013