Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/20/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/30/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/11/2013