Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/17/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/18/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 09/18/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/18/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/18/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/18/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/18/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 09/18/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/18/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/18/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/18/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/18/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/20/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/20/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/20/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/20/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/20/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/27/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/27/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/27/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/03/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/03/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/04/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 10/08/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/08/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/08/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/08/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 10/10/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/22/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/22/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/22/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/22/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/22/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/23/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/23/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 11/12/2013