Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 09/18/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 09/20/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/20/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/08/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 10/22/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/23/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 11/12/2013