There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Migratory Bird Treaty Act to exempt certain Alaskan Native articles from prohibitions against sale of items containing nonedible migratory bird parts, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/08/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7269)
09/08/2014Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-578.
09/17/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
09/09/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
09/08/2014-5:35pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/08/2014-5:35pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7269)
09/08/2014-5:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3109.
09/08/2014-5:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7269-7270)
09/08/2014-5:31pmHouseMr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/08/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 429.
09/08/2014HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-578.
07/30/2014HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
07/30/2014HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/30/2014HouseSubcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged.
07/23/2014HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs
09/20/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
09/17/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
09/17/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources09/17/2013 Referred to
07/30/2014 Markup by
09/08/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-578
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs09/20/2013 Referred to
07/23/2014 Hearings by
07/30/2014 Discharged from
Senate Environment and Public Works09/09/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3109. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/08/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Migratory Bird Treaty Act to provide that nothing in such Act prohibits possessing, selling, bartering, purchasing, shipping, and transporting any authentic Alaskan Native article of handicraft or clothing on the basis that it contains a nonedible migratory bird part. Makes such exemption inapplicable with respect to any handicraft or clothing containing any part of a migratory bird that was taken in a wasteful manner.