Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 09/17/2013
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42]* 09/17/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 10/07/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 10/11/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/16/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-23] 10/28/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 12/02/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 12/02/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/09/2014