Refine your search

Refined by:

Missouri Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/07/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 10/10/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/13/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 11/18/2013