Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25]* 09/17/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/20/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 09/20/2013
Rep. Castro, Joaquin [D-TX-20] 09/26/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/28/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 10/28/2013