Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 09/17/2013
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/03/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 10/07/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/07/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/08/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/10/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/28/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 11/18/2013